MO SJR1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 1-Sater and Onder, with SS#2 & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 1-Sater and Onder, with SS#2 & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the initiative petition process
Title
Modifies the initiative petition process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 1-Sater and Onder, with SS#2 & SA 1 (pending) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered (Walsh)--(0319S05.02S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Sater)--(0319S.05F) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Nasheed)--(0319S04.08S) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SS S offered (Sater)--(0319S.04F) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 1-Sater and Onder |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=126 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR1.pdf |