MO SJR38 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions regulating the legislature to limit the influence of partisan or other special interests

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions regulating the legislature to limit the influence of partisan or other special interests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - House - House: SJR 38 SJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SJR 38 SJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Secretary of State
2020-05-27HouseConstitutional Objection filed in House
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker
2020-05-27HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2020-05-27HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2020-05-13HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 H withdrawn
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 to HA 1 H offered (Merideth)--(4110S08.14H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 H offered (Trent)--(4110S08.13H)
2020-05-12HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-11HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-08HouseExecutive Session CANCELLED H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-07HouseExecutive Session CANCELLED H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseHearing Cancelled H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-05HouseExecutive Session continued H Rules - Legislative Oversight--Action postponed
2020-05-01HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-01HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2020-04-30HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2020-04-30HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2020-03-05HouseReferred H General Laws
2020-02-12HouseH Second Read
2020-02-11HouseH First Read
2020-02-10SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-02-10SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-10SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-05SenateHearing Cancelled S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-04SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-04SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-02-04SenatePerfected
2020-02-04SenateSS#3, as amended, S adopted
2020-02-04SenateSA 1 to SS#3 S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(4110S08.01S)
2020-02-04SenateSS#3 S offered (Hegeman)--(4110S.08F)
2020-02-04SenateSS#2 S withdrawn
2020-01-29SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2020-01-29SenateSA 1 to SS#2 S offered (Williams)--(4110S06.04S)
2020-01-29SenateSS#2 S offered (Hegeman)--(4110S.06F)
2020-01-29SenateSS S withdrawn
2020-01-29SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S withdrawn
2020-01-29SenateSA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Onder)--(4110S05.19S)
2020-01-29SenateSSA 1 for SA 1 to SS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(4110S05.20S)
2020-01-29SenateSA 1 to SS S offered (Schupp)--(4110S05.09S)
2020-01-29SenateSS S offered (Hegeman)--(4110S.05F)
2020-01-27SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-01-22SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-01-14SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SJR 38-Hegeman
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback