MO SJR40 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new constitutional amendment relating to labor organizations
Title
Creates new constitutional amendment relating to labor organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 40-Rowden |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=76888399 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR40.pdf |