MO SJR55 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Pending: Senate Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for parents' exclusive right to control the upbringing of their children
Title
Provides for parents' exclusive right to control the upbringing of their children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 55-Eigel |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27540311 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR55.pdf |