MS HB1043 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Procedure To Expunge Certain Felony Convictions For Persons Who Were Under The Age Of 18 At The Time Of Conviction; To Limit Expunctions For Public Officials; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Crimes; provide procedures for expunction of certain felonies of persons under 18 years of age at time of conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Simmons (12th),Jackson (32nd) |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Smith (39th),Cockerham |
2013-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2013-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |