MS HB1104 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-47-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "active Supervision" To Include Review Of Existing Regulations; To Amend Section 73-47-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Occupational Licensing Review Commission To Exercise Active Supervision Over Existing Occupational Regulations Promulgated By Occupational Licensing Boards; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational Licensing Review Commission; authorize to review certain existing occupational regulations to determine compliance with state policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-22HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-17HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2020-06-12SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-11SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-11SenateAmended
2020-06-09SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2020-03-09HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-09HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-03-05HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Bailey, Boyd, Criswell)
2020-03-05HousePassed
2020-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback