MS HB1150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Portion Of Highway 27 In Copiah County As "larry Grantham Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Portion Of Highway 63 In Wayne County As "william Cleo Pitts Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Bridge On Adams Street In The City Of Fulton In Itawamba County As "leland Taylor Memorial Bridge"; To Designate An Overpass Bridge On Mississippi Highway 309 In Marshall County As "jim Tuttle Memorial Overpass"; To Designate United States Highway 82 In Washington County As "delta Rhythm & Bayous Highway"; To Designate A Certain Segment Of Mississippi Highway 15 In Newton County, Mississippi, As The "raymond Comans Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Certain Segment Of Mississippi Highway 15 In Oktibbeha County, Mississippi, As The "nicky Lewis Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highway; designate various segments of highways as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Clarke,Horhn |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Ford,Arnold |
2018-03-13 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-13 | House | Reconsidered |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Busby, Massengill) |
2018-03-07 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2018-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-30 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2018-01-24 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |