MS HB1231 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Corrections And Criminal Justice Task Force To Study The Divide Between The State's Corrections System And Criminal Justice System; To Provide For The Membership Of The Task Force; To Prescribe The Duties Of The Task Force Members; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Truth in Sentencing Task Force; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-30 | Senate | Conferees Named Jackson (32nd),Simmons (12th),Tindell |
2013-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Flaggs,Dickson,Snowden |
2013-03-11 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2013-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed |
2013-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Corrections |