MS HB1249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Any County To Pay The Total Of Or Any Part Of The Cost Of Additional Benefits For The Dependents Of County Employees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Group health insurance; allow local governing authorities to pay employee's benefits for dependents.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Rep. Carl Mickens [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Carter |
2019-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Byrd,Bennett,Reynolds |
2019-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-01-31 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To County Affairs |