MS HB1251 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Allow Motor Scooters To Be Operated On Public Roads Located In Or Near A University Without Obtaining A Motorcycle Endorsement For A Rental Period Of Forty-eight Hours; To Provide Certain Requirements For The Operation Of Motor Scooters Without A Motorcycle Endorsement; To Provide That Municipalities And Universities May Prohibit Operation Of Scooters On Certain Roads If In The Interest Of Public Safety; To Amend Section 63-3-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For A Definition Of Motor Scooter And To Conform To House Bill 111, 2015 Regular Session; To Amend Section 63-1-6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform With This Act And House Bill 111, 2015 Regular Session; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor scooters; provide for operation of without motorcycle endorsement under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Butler (38th),Harkins |
2015-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Johnson,Massengill,Baker |
2015-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: HI To JB |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Judiciary, Division B |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-02-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), Johnson, Massengill) |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: JA To TR |
2015-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To JA |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Transportation;Judiciary A |