MS HB1284 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "fresh Start Act Of 2019"; To Provide That No Person Shall Be Disqualified From Pursuing, Practicing Or Engaging In Any Occupation For Which A License Is Required Solely Or In Part Because Of A Prior Conviction Of A Crime, Unless The Crime For Which The Person Was Convicted Directly Relates To The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Licensed Occupation; To Prohibit The Use Of Vague Terms Such As "moral Turpitude," "good Character" And "any Felony"; To Provide That When Promulgating Rules And Regulations Related To The Qualifications For Licensure, Licensing Authorities Shall Only Consider Criminal Records That Are Specific And Directly Related To The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Licensed Occupation; To Establish A Clear And Convincing Standard Of Proof When Determining Whether A Person Will Be Denied A License; To Authorize A Person With A Criminal Record To Petition A Licensing Authority At Any Time For A Determination Of Whether The Person's Criminal Record Will Disqualify That Person From Obtaining A License; To Require Each Licensing Authority With Established Statutory Authority Or Adopted Rules That Allow That Licensing Authority To Disqualify A Person From Pursuing Or Practicing An Occupation For Which A License Is Required Solely Or In Part Because Of A Prior Conviction Of Crime Shall Begin To Review Its Statutory Authority And Rules In Order To Propose Statutory Changes Consistent With The Certain Guidelines And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fresh Start Act of 2019; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-12HouseAmended
2019-02-08HouseRead the Third Time
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback