MS HB1297 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-41-219, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Time Limitations For Audits Of Claims Made By The Division Of Medicaid; To Provide That The Reciprocal Time Limitations For Audits Of Claims Do Not Apply To Audits That Were Opened Before July 1, 2012; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health insurance claims; revise time limitations for audits of claims made by Division of Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Toby Barker [R] | Rep. Joe Gardner [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Kirby,Bryan,Burton | |
2012-04-20 | Conferees Named Chism,Barker,Howell | |
2012-04-11 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | DR - TSDP: ME To IN | |
2012-02-28 | DR - TSDP: IN To ME | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Insurance;Medicaid |