MS HB1529 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Paying The Expenses And Providing Contingent Funds For The Legislature, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Budget Committee, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Committee On Performance Evaluation And Expenditure Review, The Expenses Of The Joint Legislative Reapportionment Committee, The Expenses Of The Joint Committee On Compilation, Revision And Publication Of Legislation, Paying The Monthly Expense Allowance Of The Members Of The Legislature, Paying The State's Share Of Various Assessments, And Related Purposes, For The Fiscal Year 2016.
Title
Appropriation; Legislative expenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Herb Frierson [R] | Rep. Bobby Shows [R] | Rep. Toby Barker [R] | Rep. Earle Banks [D] |
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] | Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. Wanda Jennings [R] | Rep. Gary Staples [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Carmichael,Burton |
2015-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Shows,Snowden |
2015-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-18 | House | Amended |
2015-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |