MS HB1530 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-91, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Compulsory-school-age Child Who Is Absent More Than 37% Of The Instructional Day Must Be Considered Absent The Entire Day; To Amend Section 37-151-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Terms "minimum School Term" And "average Daily Attendance" As Such Terms Are Used For Determining Allocations To School Districts Under The Adequate Education Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School attendance and absenteeism; standardize for compulsory attendance law & ADA calculations under MAEP.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Burton,Tollison |
2013-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Frierson,Moore,Dickson |
2013-03-26 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |