MS HB1593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Authority For Educational Television For The Fiscal Year 2019.
Title
Appropriation; Educational Television, Authority for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recommit Lost (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recommit Lost (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Motion to Recommit Lost |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Tollison,Turner-Ford |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Read,Bennett,Eure |
2018-03-13 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations |