MS HB1613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Children's Promise Act; To Authorize An Income Tax Credit For Voluntary Cash Contributions By Business Enterprises To Eligible Charitable Organizations; To Limit The Amount Of The Credit; To Provide That Unused Portions Of A Credit May Be Carried Forward For Five Consecutive Years From The Close Of The Tax Year In Which The Credit Was Earned; To Provide That Contributions For Which Credits Are Claimed Under This Act May Not Be Used As Deductions For State Tax Purposes; To Provide The Criteria That An Eligible Charitable Organization Must Meet In Order For A Contribution To The Organization To Qualify For The Credit Authorized By This Act; To Amend Section 27-7-22.39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Income Tax Credits For Voluntary Cash Contributions To Qualifying Charitable Organizations And Qualifying Foster Care Charitable Organizations, To Revise The Definitions Of The Terms "qualifying Charitable Organization", "qualifying Foster Care Charitable Organization" And "services" For The Purposes Of Such Section Of Law, To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding Certifications That Charitable Organizations Must File With The Department Of Revenue; To Increase The Maximum Aggregate Amount Of The Income Tax Credits That May Be Awarded In A Calendar Year; To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Such Section; To Amend Section 27-7-22.32, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Expenses Incurred For The Adoption Of A Child, To Extend The Reverter On The Provision Of Law That Provides That The Maximum Amount Of The Tax Credit Cannot Exceed $5,000.00 For A Child And The Provision That Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Children Adopted Through The Mississippi Department Of Child Protection Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Children's Promise Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Roun McNeal [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Doty |
2019-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Baker |
2019-03-21 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |