MS HB1628 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 935, Local And Private Laws Of 2016, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2020, To July 1, 2030, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Brandon, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Room Rentals From Hotels And Motels Within The City For The Purpose Of Funding An Amphitheatre And Other Ancillary Improvements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Brandon; extend repealer on hotels/motels to fund amphitheater and other ancillary improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |