MS HB1727 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That Any Bonds Issued By The Board Of Supervisors Of Oktibbeha County, Mississippi, For The Primary Purposes Of Repairing And Expanding The County Hospital Shall Be Subject To The Twenty Percent Limitation On Certain Indebtedness; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Oktibbeha County; increase authorized debt limit for certain bonds.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Tyrone Ellis [D] | Rep. Dannie Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Passed | |
2010-04-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-04-22 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2010-04-21 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-27 | Passed | |
2010-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-27 | DR - TSDP: WM To LP | |
2010-03-23 | DR - TSDP: LP To WM | |
2010-03-02 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means |