MS HB1728 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Additional Appropriation From The Budget Contingency Fund To The Mississippi Emergency Management Agency To Defray Eligible Covid-19 Expenses For Fiscal Year 2021; Making An Appropriation From The Budget Contingency Fund To The Mississippi Department Of Corrections For The Purpose Of Addressing Or Relating To The Public Health Emergency Due To The Covid-19 Pandemic; Making An Appropriation To The Administrative Office Of Courts For The Purpose Of Eliminating The Backlog Of Cases, Other Expenses, And Improving Telework Capabilities For Employees Due To The Covid-19 Public Health Emergency; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; additional for various state agencies for Fiscal Year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-01HouseImmediate Release
2020-07-01HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-07-01SenateImmediate Release
2020-07-01SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-07-01SenateConference Report Filed
2020-07-01HouseConference Report Filed
2020-07-01SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-07-01HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Polk
2020-06-18HouseConferees Named Read,Cockerham,White
2020-06-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-15SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-12SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-12SenateAmended
2020-06-11SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-03SenateReferred To Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-05-27HouseImmediate Release
2020-05-27HousePassed
2020-05-27HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-05-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-05-26HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1728.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1728IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1728CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1728PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1728SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1728_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1420018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1580046.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1770011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1770013.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback