MS HB666 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-605, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Raise The Minimum Age At Which A Child May Be Committed To The State Training School; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure detention; raise minimum age for youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseAllow Governor's Veto to Stand
2019-03-25HouseVeto Referred To Youth and Family Affairs
2019-03-25 Vetoed
2019-03-18SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-18HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-14SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-13SenatePassed
2019-03-13SenateAmendment Failed
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-25SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2019-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed
2019-02-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-01HouseDR - TSDP: JB To YF
2019-01-29HouseDR - TSDP: YF To JB
2019-01-16HouseReferred To Youth and Family Affairs;Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback