MS HB703 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-5-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Comply With The Constitutional Mandate To Redistrict The Trial Courts Following The Federal Decennial Census; To Amend Sections 9-5-5, 9-5-7, 9-5-9 And 9-5-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-5-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Chancellor To The Fourth Chancery District; To Amend Section 9-5-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Fifth Chancery District; To Amend Sections 9-5-21, 9-5-22, 9-5-23, 9-5-27 And 9-5-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-5-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Ninth Chancery District; To Amend Sections 9-5-35 And 9-5-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-5-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Eleventh Chancery District; To Amend Section 9-5-38, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Chancellor To The Eleventh Chancery District; To Amend Sections 9-5-39, 9-5-40 And 9-5-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-5-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Fourteenth Chancery District; To Amend Sections 9-5-47, 9-5-49 And 9-5-50, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-5-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Seventeenth Chancery District; To Amend Sections 9-5-53, 9-5-54, 9-5-55 And 9-5-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-5-58, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Chancellor To The Twentieth Chancery District; To Amend Section 9-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Comply With The Constitutional Mandate To Redistrict The Trial Courts Following The Federal Decennial Census; To Amend Sections 9-7-5, 9-7-7, 9-7-9, 9-7-11, 9-7-13, 9-7-14, 9-7-19 And 9-7-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-7-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Sixth Circuit District; To Amend Section 9-7-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Seventh Circuit District; To Amend Section 9-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-7-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Ninth Circuit District; To Amend Sections 9-7-31 And 9-7-32, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-7-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Precincts In The Eleventh Circuit District; To Amend Section 9-7-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Judge To The Twelfth Circuit District; To Amend Section 9-7-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Judge To The Thirteenth Circuit District; To Amend Sections 9-7-39 And 9-7-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-7-42, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Judge To The Fifteenth Circuit District; To Amend Sections 9-7-43, 9-7-44, 9-7-45, 9-7-49, 9-7-51 And 9-7-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 9-7-54, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Judge To The Twentieth Circuit District; To Amend Sections 9-7-55 And 9-7-57, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Corrections; To Amend Section 99-36-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow An Additional Victim Assistance Coordinator In The Fourteenth Circuit Court District; To Provide That Revised Precincts Are From The 2010 Census; To Require The Standing Joint Legislative Committee On Reapportionment To Assist The Counties In Identifying The Boundaries Of Subdistricts; To Provide For A Shortened Initial Term Of Office For New Judgeships Created Under This Act; To Specify Qualification Of Candidates For New Judgeships; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial districts; revise.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Sam Mims [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Butler (38th),Fillingane |
2015-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Snowden,Blackmon |
2015-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |