MS HB747 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Sheriff Of Rankin County To Establish A Pilot Work Release Program In Rankin County; To Authorize The Sheriff Of Rankin County To Assign A Nonviolent Convicted Offender To A Work Release Program, If The Offender Is Confined In Jail; To Provide That The Offender Assigned To The Program Shall Be Under The Supervision Of The Sheriff; To Provide That The Offender May Be Removed From The Program If Rules Are Violated; To Provide That Wages Earned By The Offender May, Upon Order Of The Court, Be Paid To The Director Or Administrator Of The Program After Standard Payroll Deductions Are Paid; To Provide That The Offender, If Approved, May Maintain A Bank Account As Long As A Physical Accounting Is Provided To The Sheriff; To Provide That The Offender's Wages May Be Distributed To Pay Certain Travel Expenses Related To His Or Her Employment, To Pay Child Support, Fines, Restitution Or Costs, Including Fees For Obtaining A Driver's License Upon Release; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Work release program; authorize pilot program to authorize sheriff to assign offenders to while confined in jail.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Newman [R] | Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Fred Shanks [R] | Rep. Price Wallace [R] |
Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] | Rep. Lee Yancey [R] | Rep. Brady Williamson [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Rep. Bo Brown [D] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Horan, Mickens, Bell (65th)) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Wiggins,Simmons (12th) |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Shanks,Felsher |
2021-03-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | Reconsidered |
2021-02-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Horan, Mickens) |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Amended |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Corrections |