MS HB777 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 73-21-83, 73-21-91, 73-21-157 And 73-21-159, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealers On Statutes Relating To The Licensure Of Pharmacy Benefit Managers; To Amend Section 73-21-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Definitions Of Pharmacy Benefit Manager And Plan In The Pharmacy Benefit Prompt Pay Act To The Definitions In The Pharmacy Audit Integrity Act, With Certain Exemptions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pharmacy benefit manager licensure statutes; extend repealers and conform certain definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Motion to Recommit Lost |
2013-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan |
2013-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Hamilton |
2013-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: PH To AC |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2013-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |