MS HB779 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 65-1-179, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise How The Emergency Road And Bridge Repair Fund Monies May Be Spent; To Amend Section 19-11-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow County Boards Of Supervisors To Expend Certain Transportation Fund Monies During The Last Term Of Office Of Such Boards; To Amend Section 65-7-95, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Exceptions To Certain Limitations On Boards Of Supervisors Awarding Of Contracts For Roads And Bridges; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Transportation funds; revise provisions regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Harkins |
2019-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Barton,Byrd |
2019-03-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-06 | House | Amended |
2019-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Transportation |