MS HB796 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-19-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Time Period For Qualification Of Certain Habitual Offenders; To Amend Section 99-19-83, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions That Regulate Habitual Offenders; To Remove Restrictions For Reduction Of Parole; To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Changes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Habitual offender; revise penalties for.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Died In Conference |
2021-03-30 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2021-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Sparks,Wiggins |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Horan,Roberson |
2021-03-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: CN To JB |
2021-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: JB To CN |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |