MS HC9 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Request The United States Army Corps Of Engineers, The Environmental Protection Agency, The Mississippi Levee Board And The Yazoo-mississippi Delta Levee Board To Take All Necessary Actions To Complete The Yazoo Backwater Pump Project As Soon As Possible.
Title
Yazoo Backwater Pump Project; support the completion of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-01-30 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Adopted |
2020-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred To Rules |