MS SB2001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Teacher Salary Scale By Increasing The Minimum Salary; To Amend Section 37-21-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Annual Salary For Teacher Assistants; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' salaries; provide for increase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09HouseDied In Committee
2020-02-19HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations
2020-02-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-02-05SenatePassed
2020-02-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-30SenateDR - TSDP: ED To AP
2020-01-14SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback