MS SB2014 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 93-21-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions In The Protection From Domestic Abuse Act; To Amend Section 93-21-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Court, In Issuing A Protection Order, To Include The Protection Of Pets In The Order; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic abuse; allow protection of pets in a protection order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseDied On Calendar
2019-03-13HouseTabled Subject To Call
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Judiciary B
2019-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-13SenatePassed
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-08SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback