MS SB2046 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 25-61-11.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Certain Information Technology Records From The Mississippi Public Records Act Of 1983; To Amend Sections 9-5-169, 25-61-5, 25-59-19, 25-61-10 And 31-7-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public Records Act; exempt certain information technology-related information from.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |