MS SB2056 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-31-104, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Amount Of Investment Required For Projects By Qualified Businesses Under The Mississippi Health Care Industry Zone Act In Order For Such Projects To Be Eligible To Be Granted A Fee-in-lieu Of Ad Valorem Taxes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fee-in-lieu of ad valorem taxes; revise investment required by qualified businesses under the MS Health Care Industry Zone Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Finance |