MS SB2107 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Charlie Ledbetter Of Clay County, Mississippi.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Charlie Ledbetter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |