MS SB2187 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 47-5-701, 47-5-703, 47-5-705, 47-5-707, 47-5-709, 47-5-711, 47-5-713, 47-5-715, 47-5-717, 47-5-719, 47-5-721, 47-5-723, 47-5-725, 47-5-727 And 47-5-729, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Prison Overcrowding Emergency Powers Act; To Reenact And Amend Section 47-5-731, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repeal Date To July 1, 2014, On The Prison Overcrowding Emergency Powers Act In Sections 47-5-701 Through 47-5-729; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Corrections; extend repeal date on the Prison Overcrowding Emergency Powers Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-26 | Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-21 | Referred To Corrections | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-01-20 | Referred To Corrections |