MS SB2187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 19-5-21 And 21-19-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Counties And Municipalities To Levy A Penalty For The Late Payment Of Garbage Fees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties & municipalities; authorize to levy a penalty for the late payment of garbage fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: MU To CA |
2017-01-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: CA To MU |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs;Municipalities |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/SB/SB2187.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2100-2199/SB2187IN.htm |