MS SB2230 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 83-11-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Coverage Under The Uninsured Motorist Act For Claims Involving Vehicles Owned Or Operated By A Person Or Entity Protected By Immunity Under The Mississippi Tort Claims Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uninsured Motorist Act; provide coverage for claims involving vehicles owned or operated by persons protected by the MS Tort Claims Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10 Approved by Governor
2020-06-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-05-29HouseReturned For Enrolling
2020-05-28HousePassed
2020-05-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-21HouseReferred To Insurance
2020-02-17SenateTransmitted To House
2020-02-13SenatePassed
2020-02-12SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-31SenateReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback