MS SB2286 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-21-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Under The Early Learning Collaborative Act; To Prescribe Minimum Funding Levels For Prekindergarten Programs; To Authorize Technical Teacher And Teacher Assistant Support Services; To Require Individualized Professional Development Plans And Approved Curriculum; To Require The Department Of Education To Provide The Governor And The Legislature With An Evaluation Of Program Effectiveness; To Require The Peer Committee To Review The Department Of Education's Evaluations And Annual Reports And Submit A Summary Of Its Findings To The Legislature; To State The Intent Of The Legislature To Increase Appropriated Funds Annually; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Early Learning Collaborative Act of 2013; revise funding and specify teaching standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2020-06-27 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,Cockerham,McCarty |
2020-06-26 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,Carpenter,McCarty |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Wiggins,McMahan |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-19 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-17 | House | Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED |
2020-06-01 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-19 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |