MS SB2296 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That All Individual And Group Health Insurance Contracts Providing Prescription Drug Coverage In The State Shall Apply A Prorated Daily Cost-sharing Rate For A Partial Supply To Allow Beneficiaries To Synchronize Their Medications On The Same Day Each Month; To Provide That This Medication Synchronization Authority Shall Be Fully Applicable To The State And School Employees Health Insurance Plan And The Mississippi Medicaid Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Group health insurance plan coverage for prescription drugs; authorize medication synchronization for beneficiaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-22 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-21 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Chism, Touchstone) |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Amendment Withdrawn |
2018-02-21 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2018-02-21 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |