MS SB2305 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-54.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalty For Human Trafficking Of A Minor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Human trafficking; increase certain penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,White,Ford |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,DeBar,Watson |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Cockerham, Bailey) |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |