MS SB2311 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 83-11-1, 83-11-7, 83-5-28, 71-3-77 And 83-11-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Notice Of Nonrenewal Is Not Required When A Replacement Policy Form Is Issued By The Same Insurer Or When An Insured Is Transferred To A Licensed Affiliate Of The Insurer, So Long As The Transfer Or Replacement Results In The Same Or Substantially Similar Coverage; To Provide That Documents Signed By The Insured Are Applicable To The Replacement Policy Form, The Coverage Transferred To A Licensed Affiliate Insurer, Or Both, And Remain Valid And Enforceable; To Require A Transferring Insurer To Provide Notice Of The Policy Transfer To The Mississippi Insurance Department And To The Policyholder; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance companies; revise notice requirements when transferring policies to an affiliated insurer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |