MS SB2349 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-67-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Licensees Under The Small Loan Regulatory Law May Solicit And Collect The Insurance Premium Required From Borrowers Who Purchase Noncredit Insurance Policies, If Certain Conditions Are Met; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Small loan licensees; may solicit and collect insurance premiums on noncredit insurance if certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-17 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-14 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Campbell,Bell (21st) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Parks,Wilemon,Caughman |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Zuber, Campbell) |
2016-03-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-28 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |