MS SB2370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By House Bill No. 545, 2015 Regular Session, To Authorize The Pharmacy And Therapeutics Committee Of The Division Of Medicaid To Meet As Necessary To Fulfill Its Responsibilities; To Revise The Composition And The Duties Of The Medical Care Advisory Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Division of Medicaid; clarify meetings of Pharmacy and Therapeutics (PNT) Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Vetoed | |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Howell,Barker,Baker |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Bryan,Parks |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JA To ME |
2015-02-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ME To JA |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Medicaid;Judiciary A |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |