MS SB2388 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-261, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Adult To Obtain A Copy Of His Own Youth Court Record; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Youth court records; adult can obtain own.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-30 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Crawford,Denny |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Tindell,Hill |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |