MS SB2459 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-44-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Change The Short Title Of The Mississippi Street Gang Act To "the Mississippi Gang Act"; To Amend Section 97-44-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 97-44-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Penalties For Criminal Gang Activity; To Create New Section 97-44-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Civil Cause Of Action Based On Gang Activity; To Create New Section 97-44-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify Venue; To Create New Section 97-44-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Service Of Process; To Create New Section 97-44-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Injunctive Relief; To Create New Section 97-44-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Forfeiture Of Real And Personal Property; To Create New Section 97-35-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Threats Against A Law Enforcement Officer Or Judge; To Provide That Offenders Who Are Convicted Of Conducting Or Participating In Criminal Gang Activity Shall Not Be Eligible For Parole Or Any Early Release Program Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections; To Amend Sections 97-3-2, 47-5-138.1, 47-5-139 And 47-5-142, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Sections 13-7-5 And 13-7-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Provisions Of Law Applicable To Grand Jury Proceedings; To Repeal Sections 97-44-9, 97-44-11, 97-44-13, 97-44-15, 97-44-17 And 97-44-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Constituted Various Provisions In The Street Gang Act That Are Eliminated Or Subsumed Under This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Gang act; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |