MS SB2461 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Commission On Perry-richton Consolidated School District Structure To Make Recommendations To The 2018 Regular Session Of The Legislature Regarding The Method For Consolidating The County Into One School District With One Local School Board; To Amend Section 37-7-104.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Millage On All Taxable Property In Oktibbeha County Affected By The Consolidation Of The Starkville-oktibbeha School District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district consolidation; establish Commission on Perry-Richton Consolidated School District Structure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Rpt Ruled Improper |
2017-03-28 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2017-03-28 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Roberson,Barker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Clarke,Hopson |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Education |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Education |