MS SB2463 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-26-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase To 15 Years The Maximum Period Of Time That The Mississippi Development Authority May Make Payments From The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Fund To An Approved Participant In The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Program; To Amend Section 57-26-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By Senate Bill No. 2806, 2012 Regular Session, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "tourism Project" For Purposes Of The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Program To Include Certain Tourism Attractions Located Within Historic Districts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Fund; increase maximum period of time that MDA may make payments from.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2013-04-02 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Martinson,Staples,Rogers (61st) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Conferees Named Chassaniol,Gollott,Tindell |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPAA: WM To TO |
2013-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: TO To WM |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-28 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To FI |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Finance |