MS SB2541 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Fantasy Contest Task Force; To Create The Fantasy Contest Act; To Create New Section 97-33-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact A Short Title; To Create New Section 97-33-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact Definitions; To Create New Section 97-33-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Operator Of A Fantasy Contest With An Entry Fee Must Implement Certain Procedures, Contract With A Third Party To Annually Perform An Independent Audit To Ensure Compliance With This Act And Submit The Results To The Gaming Commission; To Create New Section 97-33-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That The Operator Of A Fantasy Contest With An Entry Fee Must Register Under The Act; To Create New Section 97-33-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Civil Penalty For Violations Of This Act And To Provide That Certain Civil And Criminal Penalties Shall Not Apply To Fantasy Contest Operators Who Comply With The Provisions Of This Act; To Create New Section 97-33-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Gaming Control Act Shall Not Apply To Fantasy Contests; To Create Section 97-33-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Sunset Of The Fantasy Contest Act; To Create Section 97-33-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Resolution Of Disputes Over Winnings; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fantasy Contest Act; enact to require fantasy contest operators to implement certain procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 83 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Failed to Suspend Rules (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 83 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Failed to Suspend Rules (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | Motion to Recommit Lost |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-15 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,Ladner,DeLano |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Tindell,DeBar,Doty |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-29 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-29 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-23 | House | Failed to Suspend Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred To Gaming |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |