MS SB2564 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-40-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "project" As Used In The Energy Infrastructure Revolving Loan Program; To Amend Section 57-40-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Fund May Be Used To Assist Energy-providing Utilities; To Amend Sections 57-40-5 And 57-40-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Energy Infrastructure Revolving Loan Program; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Staples,Middleton |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Burton,Ward,Butler (38th) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-01 | House | Amended |
2013-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Energy |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-02-04 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: EN To FI |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Finance |