MS SB2572 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-177-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Direct The State Department Of Education To Conduct A Reading Intervention Pilot Program In One Or More "c" Level Or Low-performing School Districts; To Establish A Kindergarten Readiness Assessment Program In The State Department Of Education; To Amend Section 37-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Certain Education Requirements For Initial Elementary Education Licensure Effective July 1, 2016; To Establish A Middle School Dropout Prevention Pilot Program In Certain "d" And "f" Rated School Districts Selected By The State Board Of Education; To Require That The Educational Services In The Pilot Program Be Provided By A Nonprofit Or For-profit Educational Entity Approved By The Board; To Require The Local School Board Of The Selected Districts To Report Enrollment To The State Department Of Education; To Prescribe The Minimum Necessary Requirements Of The Pilot Programs, Its Objectives And The Education Partner Selected By The State Board Of Education To Provide The Services; To Require The State Board Of Education To Develop And Implement An Alternative Student Performance Accountability Method To Evaluate The Performance And Effectiveness Of Pilot Program School Districts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Literacy based promotion program; SDE conduct pilot program in one or more "C" level school districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Busby,Clarke |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Burton,Wiggins |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-06 | House | Amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred To Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Education |