MS SB2599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Provides For A Diversion Of Sales Tax Revenue To The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; To Repeal Section 57-1-451, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund And To Provide That The Remaining Balance In The Fund Shall Be Transferred To The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; repeal and transfer balance to the General Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2019-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Johnson (94th) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Chassaniol |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |