MS SB2612 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "municipality" To Include The Cities Of Natchez, Laurel, Clinton, Cleveland, Vicksburg, Ridgeland, Brandon, Flowood And Clarksdale Under The Law That Authorizes The Governing Authorities Of Certain Municipalities To Establish Leisure And Recreation Districts Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; To Revise The Areas In Which The City Of Jackson May Establish Leisure And Recreation Districts; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Madison County To Create Leisure And Recreation Districts In Certain Areas Of The County Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; To Authorize Lee County To Establish One Or More Leisure And Recreation Districts Within The County; To Authorize Rankin County To Establish One Or More Leisure And Recreation Districts Within The County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law; revise provisions regarding leisure and recreation districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 85 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Zuber |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Chassaniol,Simmons (13th),Harkins |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Powell, Smith, Lamar) |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Tourism |