MS SB2626 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-99-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "service Grant"; To Define "primary Care Physician," "care Grant" And "physician Grant"; To Amend Section 41-99-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Purpose Of The Mississippi Qualified Health Center Grant Program To Include The Use Of Service Grants To Provide Salary Supplements To Recruit And Retain New Primary Care Physicians In Order To Increase Health Care Access To Patients In Mississippi; To Amend Section 41-99-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Physician Grant Awarded To A Mississippi Qualified Health Center Shall Only Be Used By That Center To Provide A One-time Salary Supplement To A Primary Care Physician Being Recruited And Retained Under The Program; To Provide That A Mississippi Qualified Health Center May Only Receive One Physician Grant Under The Program Per Fiscal Year; To Provide That A Primary Care Physician In Receipt Of A Physician Grant Shall Work At Least Three Consecutive Years At The Mississippi Qualified Health Center; To Require The Mississippi Qualified Health Center To Provide An Annual Report To The Department; To Require The Department To Submit Those Reports Annually To The Chair And Vice Chair Of The Senate Public Health And Welfare Committee, To The Chair And Vice Chair Of The House Public Health And Human Services Committee And To The Lieutenant Governor; To Amend Section 41-99-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Qualified Health Center Grant Program; provide for physician grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | House | Amended |
2020-06-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PH To AP |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |